Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2813096 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280069121 EP12867969



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013116984Global Dossier 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN70921 07.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9648535Global Dossier 09.05.2017B2
US2014362691 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN70921 07.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104094619Global Dossier 08.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012CN70921 07.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2813096Global Dossier 23.10.2019B1
EP2813096 28.10.2015A4
EP2813096 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN70921 07.02.2012