Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813643

EP2813643 - PUMP TRUCK STABILITY CONTROL SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD, AND PUMP TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hunan Sany Intelligent Control Equipment Co., Ltd
Sany Industry Town
Economic and Technological Development Zone
Changsha, Hunan 410100 / CN
For all designated states
Sany Heavy Industry Co., Ltd.
Sany Industry Town
Economic and Technological Development Zone
Changsha, Hunan 410100 / CN
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Xiaogang
Sany Industry Town
Economic and Technological Development Zone
Changsha Hunan 410100 / CN
02 / WU, Mingling
Sany Industry Town
Economic and Technological Development Zone
Changsha Hunan 410100 / CN
03 / WEI, Zhikui
Sany Industry Town
Economic and Technological Development Zone
Changsha Hunan 410100 / CN
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date12868115.214.04.2012
[2016/33]
WO2012CN74038
Priority number, dateCN2012102529206.02.2012         Original published format: CN201210025292
[2014/51]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117046
Date:15.08.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813643
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813643
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:E04G21/02, F16F15/02, E04G21/04
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/51]E04G21/02, F16F15/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DER STABILITÄT EINES PUMPWAGENS, STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PUMPWAGEN[2014/51]
English:PUMP TRUCK STABILITY CONTROL SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD, AND PUMP TRUCK[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE LA STABILITÉ D'UN CAMION PORTE-POMPE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET CAMION PORTE-POMPE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014Translation filed 
26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Search fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
23.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2016Fee for grant paid
01.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2016
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.04.2012
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
GB14.04.2017
IE14.04.2017
LU14.04.2017
MT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
GB14.04.2017
IE14.04.2017
LU14.04.2017
MT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
GB14.04.2017
IE14.04.2017
LU14.04.2017
MT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
GB14.04.2017
LU14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/07]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011120396  (HUNAN SANY INTELLIGENT CONTROL [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045]; figure 2 *;
 [A]CN102330498  (CHANGSHA ZOOMLION HEAVY IND) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US6755212  (ANDERSON THOMAS M [US] ET AL) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 38 - line 50 *;
 [A]CN102147959  (BUILDING MACHINERY CO LTD XCMG CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101967883  (ANHUI XINGMA AUTOMOBILE CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2001090342  (KYOKUTO KAIHATSU KOGYO CO) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2005068777  (TOBISHIMA CONSTRUCT CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[A]CN102330498  (CHANGSHA ZOOMLION HEAVY INDUSTRY SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT CO.,);
 [A]CN102147959  (XCMG CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. BUILDING MACHINERY CO.);
 [A]CN101967883  (ANHUI XINGMAAUTOMOBILE CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2001090342  (KYOKUTO KAIHATSU KOGYO CO.);
 [A]JP2005068777  (TOBISHIMA CONSTRUCT CO., LTD.)