Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814238

EP2814238 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.01.2015
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.02.2015  [2015/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIMURA, Shinichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / KASAI, Masanori
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / KAWAZOE, Daisuke
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / YOSHIMURA, Shin
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date12868308.315.11.2012
WO2012JP79622
Priority number, dateJP2012002590409.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012025904
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118364
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814238
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/232, G06T5/00
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN[2014/51]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD[2014/51]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2014Translation filed 
02.08.2014National basic fee paid 
02.08.2014Search fee paid 
02.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
13.01.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2006310999  (SONY CORP.);
 [X]JP2007243917  (NIKON CORP.)