Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814238 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814238



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 150
21.01.2015 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.08.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
03.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
29.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
29.04.2014 Description Search / examination 22
29.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 13
29.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
03.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 35