Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815532

EP2815532 - AUDIO RECEIVER AND SAMPLE RATE CONVERTER WITHOUT PLL OR CLOCK RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019 [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / RUAN, Wei
14232 S 8th St.
Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/32]
Former [2014/52]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12868502.113.02.2012
[2019/32]
WO2012US24844
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122562
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815532
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2815532
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L7/02, H04N21/242, H03L7/00, H04N5/04
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/52]H04L7/02, H04N21/242
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUDIOEMPFÄNGER UND ABTASTRATENUMSETZER OHNE PLL-ODER TAKTRÜCKGEWINNUNG[2014/52]
English:AUDIO RECEIVER AND SAMPLE RATE CONVERTER WITHOUT PLL OR CLOCK RECOVERY[2014/52]
French:RÉCEPTEUR AUDIO ET CONVERTISSEUR DE TAUX D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE SANS PLL OU RÉCUPÉRATION D'HORLOGE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
06.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2019Fee for grant paid
01.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201807   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO9628918  (SARNOFF DAVID RES CENTER [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 3 - page 11, line 29 * * page 13, line 16 - page 18, line 2 *;
 [IY]US2008024661  (TUNG HSU-JUNG [TW]) [I] 1,5,13 * the whole document * [Y] 3,10-12;
 [I]US2009268091  (KOUYAMA KUNIHIKO [JP]) [I] 1,5,13 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2009167366  (WANG HUI-MIN [TW]) [I] 1,5,13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2006104397  (LOTTIS KENT D [US], et al) [Y] 3,10-12 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007]; figures 3-6; claims 10-23 *
International search[A]US2010153122  (WANG ZHICHENG LANCELOT [US], et al);
 [A]US2008168294  (BATSON JAMES D [US], et al);
 [A]US7474724  (GUDMUNSON DANIEL [US], et al);
 [A]US2007030387  (KIM KI-SUK [KR])
by applicantWO9628918
 US2008024661