Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816506

EP2816506 - CHARACTER-RECOGNITION METHOD AND CHARACTER-RECOGNITION DEVICE AND PROGRAM USING SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIEDA Shiro
c/o OMRON CORPORATION
801 Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Kilian Kilian & Partner
Aidenbachstraße 54
81379 München / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date12868534.428.11.2012
WO2012JP80702
Priority number, dateJP2012003288917.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012032889
[2014/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121648
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816506
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/68, G06K9/20, G06K9/34, G06K9/62
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZEICHENERKENNUNG ZEICHENERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE PROGRAMM MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN[2014/52]
English:CHARACTER-RECOGNITION METHOD AND CHARACTER-RECOGNITION DEVICE AND PROGRAM USING SAID METHOD[2014/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE CARACTÈRES ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE DE CARACTÈRES, PROGRAMME UTILISANT LEDIT PROCÉDÉ[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2014Translation filed 
05.09.2014National basic fee paid 
05.09.2014Search fee paid 
05.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
16.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2019
01.10.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]GB2208735  (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-5 * page 29, line 19 - page 33, line 28; figure 9 *;
 [I]JPH07262322  (NTT DATA TSUSHIN KK) [I] 1-5 * §§ 7, 11, 17, and 20;; figures 3, 9, 10 * * abstract *;
 [I]US6535619  (SUWA MISAKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 4; figures 3, 11-14, 17, 19 * * column 23, line 3 - column 24, line 16 *
International search[Y]JPH04289988  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPH05128299  (CANON INC.);
 [Y]JPH03214286  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JPH02230484  (HITACHI ENGINEERING CO., LTD.)
by applicantJPH09282417
 JP2010044485