Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816234

EP2816234 - PUMP DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, IS, LV, RS
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ulvac Kiko, Inc.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi, Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / NONOMURA, Yuji
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
02 / SUZUKI, Sachie
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
03 / ITOYAMA, Ryuji
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
04 / YAMANAKA, Akihiro
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date12868599.716.02.2012
[2019/03]
WO2012JP01022
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121462
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816234
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816234
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:F04B43/04, F04B45/047, F04B49/20, F04B49/06, F04B45/04, F04B49/10, F04B53/10, F04B43/02
[2017/42]
Former International [2015/52]F04B49/06, F04B45/04, F04B43/02, F04B49/10, F04B53/10
Former International [2014/52]F04B49/06, F04B45/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PUMPVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON[2014/52]
English:PUMP DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME[2014/52]
French:DISPOSITIF DE POMPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CE DISPOSITIF[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2014Translation filed 
06.08.2014National basic fee paid 
06.08.2014Search fee paid 
06.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
15.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2018Fee for grant paid
10.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
16.09.201403   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL16.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]CA2691228  (TRIDO IND INC [CA]) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 14 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 12 - page 17, line 27 * * figures 1,2,10 *;
 [A]US2009317678  (BONO TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]JP2008146938  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2010138708  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009019943  (OZAWA YUKIO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 8-13 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0094] *
International search[A]JP2007234443  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2005251694  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2009047084
 JP2007234443