EP2816715 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Mitsubishi-Electric Industrial Systems Corporation 3-1-1, Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKAWA, Eiichi c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 3-1-1 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/52] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12868725.8 | 15.02.2012 | [2023/01] | WO2012JP53552 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013121540 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816715 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816715 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02J3/38 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H02M7/48 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J4/00 (US);
H02M1/08 (US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J3/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H02M7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/52] | English: | POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2014/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE POUR DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2014 | Translation filed | 12.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 08.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2021 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | IE | 15.02.2023 | LU | 15.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | FR | 04.03.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | DE | 01.09.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 15.02.2023 | ||
LU | 15.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
DE | 01.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 15.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 15.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003332603 (CANON KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12 * paragraph [0016]; figure 9 *[I] 3,7,11 | International search | [Y]JPH089555 (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER); | [Y]JPH0870533 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [X]JP2003332603 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2004020122 (O M SOLAR KYOKAI KK, et al); | [A]JP2006278858 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2010187030 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |