Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815747

EP2815747 - INTRAORAL SOLUBLE-TYPE FILM PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]INTRAORALLY DISSOLVING FILM PREPARATION
[2018/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyukyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
2-10, Nihonbashihoncho 4-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
[2018/24]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Kyukyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
2-10, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHISE, Akihiro
c/o KYUKYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
1203-1 Hibarigoho
Imizu-shi Toyama 939-0351 / JP
02 / NISHIKAWA, Hisanobu
c/o KYUKYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
1203-1 Hibarigoho
Imizu-shi Toyama 939-0351 / JP
 [2018/35]
Representative(s)Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date12868824.912.12.2012
[2018/18]
WO2012JP82210
Priority number, dateJP2012002980814.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012029808
[2014/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121663
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815747
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815747
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2815747
Date:27.06.2018
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/10, A61K47/20, A61K9/70, A61K31/4525, A61K31/445, A61K31/4725
[2017/49]
Former International [2015/33]A61K9/70, A61K47/10, A61K47/20, A61K47/30, A61K31/445, A61K31/4725, A61K9/00, A61K31/4525
Former International [2014/52]A61K9/70, A61K47/10, A61K47/20, A61K47/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LÖSLICHES ORALES FILMPRÄPARAT[2017/49]
English:INTRAORAL SOLUBLE-TYPE FILM PREPARATION[2018/24]
French:PRÉPARATION DE FILM BUCCAL SOLUBLE[2017/49]
Former [2014/52]HERSTELLUNG EINER INTRAORAL AUFLÖSENDEN FOLIE
Former [2014/52]INTRAORALLY DISSOLVING FILM PREPARATION
Former [2014/52]PRÉPARATION DE FILM SE DISSOLVANT PAR VOIE INTRA-ORALE
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014Translation filed 
25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Search fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
19.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2018Fee for grant paid
22.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.04.2018Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2017
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
01.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
LU12.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
LU12.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2011016781
 [XI]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 15, Database accession no. 2011-B06406, XP002741904 & JP2011016781 A 20110127 (TEIKA SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [I] 3,4,7
International search[X]WO2011020610  (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG);
 [Y]WO2008149440  (SATO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2006519202  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH);
 [A]JP2010270142  (BIOALLIANCE PHARMA);
 [YP]JP2012240949  (TOYO SUGAR CO., LTD.)
by applicantJPH11116469
 JP2004043450
 JP2005263704