Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815668

EP2815668 - SHOE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, LU
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASICS Corporation
1-1, Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8555 / JP
[2018/38]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
ASICS Corporation
1-1 Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 650-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANIGUCHI, Norihiko
c/o ASICS Corporation
1-1, Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8555 / JP
02 / MORIYASU, Kenta
c/o ASICS Corporation
1-1, Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8555 / JP
 [2019/06]
Former [2014/52]01 / TANIGUCHI, Norihiko
c/o ASICS Corporation
1-1 Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8555 / JP
02 / MORIYASU, Kenta
c/o ASICS Corporation
1-1 Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/06]
Former [2014/52]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12868845.417.02.2012
[2019/06]
WO2012JP53817
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121578
Date:22.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815668
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815668
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A43B23/02, B29D35/14, A43B7/14, A43C1/00, B29D35/06, B29D35/08
[2016/09]
Former International [2015/42]A43B23/02, B29D35/14, A43B7/14, A43C1/00
Former International [2014/52]A43B23/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/52]
English:SHOE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2014/52]
French:CHAUSSURE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014Translation filed 
21.08.2014National basic fee paid 
21.08.2014Search fee paid 
21.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
19.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2018Fee for grant paid
17.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
LU17.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/46]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US2147197  (GLIDDEN ALFRED A) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]EP1864584  (TIMBERLAND CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0084] , [0085] , [0088]; figures 9A-9G *;
 [XI]US5678329  (GRIFFIN THOMAS J [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 45-47; figure 4; claims 1,4 * [I] 2,3,5,6;
 [X]FR2484215  (PIRAUD ROBERT [FR]) [X] 7-11 * figures 1-3; claim - *;
 [A]GB502685  (DAVID GORDON GASH) [A] 9 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP1511615  (MOSCATO CLAUDIO [IT]) [A] 10,11 * figure -; claim - *
International search[X]JP2007050157  (MIZUNO INC.);
 [Y]JP2009148477  (SRI SPORTS LTD.);
 [Y]JP2003265202  (ACHILLES CORP.)
by applicantJP2004105323