Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814335

EP2814335 - METHODS FOR MAKING MILK-LIKE BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.10.2017  [2017/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / SHE, Manjuan, Jenny
835 Chouteau Avenue
St. Louis, Missouri 63102 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Krishnan, Sri , et al
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12868890.008.06.2012
WO2012US41474
Priority number, dateUS201261599595P16.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599595 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122616
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814335
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/19, A23K1/16, A23K1/175
[2015/13]
Former International [2014/52]A23L1/19
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MILCHÄHNLICHER GETRÄNKE[2014/52]
English:METHODS FOR MAKING MILK-LIKE BEVERAGES[2014/52]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE BOISSONS DE TYPE LAIT[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2014National basic fee paid 
12.08.2014Search fee paid 
12.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
23.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/42]
12.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2010114627  (NESTEC SA [CH]; PARTHASARATHY MUKUND [US]) [X] 2-20 * claims 1-26 * [Y] 1;
 [IAY]US5906847  (ENGEL HANS [CH] ET AL) [I] 1-19 * column 3, line 51 - line 57; example 1 * [A] 20 [Y] 1
International search[X]WO2010114627  (PARTHASARATHY);
 [Y]US6777391  (KRATKY ET AL)