Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818006

EP2818006 - METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING A NETWORK ACCESS SUBSCRIPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/01]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING A NETWORK ACCESS SUBSCRIPTION
[2018/47]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2019/19]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KAIKKONEN, Jorma
Kuuselantie 8
FI-90800 Oulu / FI
02 / KOSKINEN, Jussi-Pekka
Kuuraparrantie 25 A 5
FI-90630 Oulu / FI
03 / KOSKELA, Jarkko
Kajuuttapiha 3
FI-90510 Oulu / FI
04 / VASENKARI, Petri
Vesivuotavantie 4
FI-20250 Turku / FI
05 / PIRILÄ, Hannu
Leppärinne 18
FI-20660 Littoinen / FI
06 / NIELSEN, Sari
Bredankuja 7 G 25
FI-02750 Espoo / FI
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/19]
Former [2015/01]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date12869032.822.02.2012
[2019/19]
WO2012IB50814
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013124708
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818006
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818006
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/12, H04M15/00, H04W4/24, H04W48/18
[2018/47]
Former International [2015/01]H04W48/18, H04M15/00, H04W4/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL EINES NETZWERKZUGANGSABONNEMENTS[2018/47]
English:METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING A NETWORK ACCESS SUBSCRIPTION[2018/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET APPAREIL POUR SÉLECTIONNER UN ABONNEMENT D'ACCÈS À UN RÉSEAU[2018/47]
Former [2015/01]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL EINES NETZWERKZUGANGSABONNEMENTS
Former [2015/01]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING A NETWORK ACCESS SUBSCRIPTION
Former [2015/01]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SÉLECTIONNER UN ABONNEMENT D'ACCÈS À UN RÉSEAU
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Search fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
22.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2019Fee for grant paid
22.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2007105000  (GHOST TELECOM LTD [GB]; CAMILLERI MICHAEL [GB]; MERINO GONZALEZ JOSE L) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 * * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 21 * * page 5, line 10 - line 27 * * page 9, line 18 - line ll * * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 15 * * page 21, line 30 - page 23, line 27 *;
 [Y]US2008101567  (BAUDINO DANIEL A [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] *;
 [Y]US2008056286  (FORSSELL MIKA [FI] ET AL) [Y] 3,8,13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]EP0724371  (CABLE & WIRELESS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009149220  (CAMILLERI MICHAEL [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]EP0724371  (CABLE & WIRELESS PLC);
 [X]WO2007105000  (GHOST TELECOM LTD ET AL);
 [A]WO2011080637  (TURKCELL TEKNOLOJI ARASTIRMA VE GELISTIRME ANONIM SIRKETI ET AL);
 [A]KR20110056164  (LG ELECTRONICS INC);
 [A]WO03100647  (RUSSELL JESSE E);
 [E]EP2448301  (APPLE INC)
ExaminationUS2007015536
by applicantWO2007105000
 US2008101567