Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817755

EP2817755 - DIRECTED WAKEUP INTO A SECURED SYSTEM ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Thiam Ern
A-5-5 Regency Heights
Jalan Cangkat Kenari
Bayan Lepas
11900 Pulau Pinang / MY
02 / TEH, Wan Chin
72 Solok Nuri
Setia Pulau Mutiara
Bayan Lepas
11950 Pulau Pinang / MY
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Jennings, Vincent Louis
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date12869115.120.02.2012
WO2012MY00028
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125937
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817755
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/81, G06F21/74, // G06F1/32
[2015/33]
Former International [2015/01]G06F21/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:GERICHTETES AUFWECKEN IN EINER GESICHERTEN SYSTEMUMGEBUNG[2015/01]
English:DIRECTED WAKEUP INTO A SECURED SYSTEM ENVIRONMENT[2015/01]
French:RÉVEIL SÉLECTIF DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME SÉCURISÉ[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Search fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
09.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5878264  (EBRAHIM ZAHIR [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 27 * * column 8, line 35 - column 8, line 60 * * column 9, line 32 - column 9, line 57 * * column 10, line 62 - column 12, line 57 * * figure 7 * [I] 4,5,9,10,14,15;
 [A]US2006224878  (DATTA SHAMANNA M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0034] - [0036] - [0046] - [0051] * * figures 2, 5 *;
 [A]US2004003273  (GRAWROCK DAVID W [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0026] , [0033] - [0038] - [0048] , [0049] * * figures 1, 2, 4 *
International search[Y]US2008082845  (TOSHIKAZU MORISAWA);
 [Y]US2010275046  (SHIMAZAKI YASUHITO ET AL.);
 [A]US2011161694  (FUJIWARA NAOKI);
 [A]US7822960  (ZIMMER VINCENT J. ET AL.)
by applicantUS5878264