Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2817755

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure29.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Search fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140717
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 21/74 20130101ALI20150707BHEP
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 1/32 20060101ALN20150707BHEP
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20150713
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06F 21/81 20130101AFI20150707BHEP
 
Event date:22.08.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20180720