Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819272

EP2819272 - NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER TRANSFER DEVICE, NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER RECEPTION DEVICE, AND NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER RECEPTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / ICHIKAWA, Shinji
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/51]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2015/01]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12869215.922.02.2012
[2017/51]
WO2012JP54221
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013124977
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819272
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819272
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60L11/18, H02J5/00, H04B5/00, H02J7/02
[2016/10]
Former International [2015/01]H02J17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTAKTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KONTAKTLOSE STROMEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND KONTAKTLOSES STROMEMPFANGSSYSTEM[2015/01]
English:NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER TRANSFER DEVICE, NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER RECEPTION DEVICE, AND NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER RECEPTION SYSTEM[2015/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT, ET SYSTÈME DE RÉCEPTION DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2014Translation filed 
15.08.2014National basic fee paid 
15.08.2014Search fee paid 
15.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
26.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2017Fee for grant paid
10.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17199558.2  / EP3300212
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2016
Opposition(s)21.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
IE22.02.2018
LU22.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
IE22.02.2018
LU22.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
LU22.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/44]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011169337  (KOZAKAI OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,4,9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0037] , [0041] , [0063] , [0064] , [0071] , [0077] , [0078] , [0108] , [0127] * * claims 1,2,3,4,5 *;
 [XI]US2009325651  (KONDO YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,13,14 * abstract * * figures 2,4a,43,4c,5a,5b,5c,6,10 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0039] * [I] 5,6,11,12;
 [XA]US2011241616  (KIM NAM YUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,13,14 * abstract * * figures 5,6,7 * * claim 1 * [A] 5,6,11,12
International search[X]JP2010158151  (TOYOTA IND CORP);
 [A]JP2010252497  (FUJITSU TEN LTD);
 [A]JP2011125138  (CANON KK);
 [A]JP2008283791  (OLYMPUS CORP)
by applicantJP2010172084
 JP2011016736
 US2010259110
 JP2000269059