Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2822233 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2822233



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 164
11.10.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
16.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 20
02.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.01.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
02.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
15.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
01.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
10.02.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
10.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
08.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
24.09.2014 Description Search / examination 14
24.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
24.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
06.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 13