Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2822233


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
09.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
04.11.2016 (Expected) grant published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
08.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
05.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
05.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
16.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication