Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822233

EP2822233 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
1026-6, Hogye-Dong
Dongan-Gu, Anyang
Gyeonggi-Do 431-080 / KR
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sung Han
1-301 Yuhwan 3 Cha Apt.
Hogye-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-849 / KR
02 / KWON, Dae Hyun
101-1508 Heungwha Brownville
337 Hogye 2-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-830 / KR
03 / OH, Joon Seok
102-202 Hansol Solpark Apt.
Dangjeong-dong
Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-778 / KR
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date12869668.922.10.2012
[2016/49]
WO2012KR08655
Priority number, dateUS201261605759P02.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261605759 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013129753
Date:06.09.2013
Language:KO
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822233
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2822233
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/417, H04L12/18
[2015/42]
Former International [2015/02]H04L12/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2015/02]
English:COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD[2015/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase24.09.2014Translation filed 
24.09.2014National basic fee paid 
24.09.2014Search fee paid 
24.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2016Fee for grant paid
24.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2016
Opposition(s)08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.10.2012
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MK07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU22.10.2012
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU22.10.2012
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/29]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/52]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US6070193  (SEGAL EDWARD ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 23 *;
 [A]US5968154  (CHO JIN YOUNG [KR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 7, line 22 - column 11, line 13 *;
 [A]EP1427132  (ALCATEL CANADA INC [CA]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] - [0016] - [0019] *
International search[Y]KR20030084162  ((KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE) 01);
 [Y]KR20080020807  (POSCON CORPORATION);
 [A]KR20040036279  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH07203035  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)