Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2820899

EP2820899 - LOCATION DISCREPANCY CORRECTIONS BASED ON COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS AND TRAJECTORY DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / WOUHAYBI, Rita H.
16046 NW Trakehner Way
Portland, OR 97229 / US
02 / KOHLENBERG, Tobias M.
9915 SW 48th Ave
Portland, OR 97219 / US
03 / MO, Stanley
2111 NE 25th Ave
JF1-255
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
04 / MIAN, Mubashir A.
7910 Churchill Street
Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US
 [2015/20]
Former [2015/02]01 / WOUHAYBI, Rita H.
16046 NW Trakehner Way
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
02 / KOHLENBERG, Tobias M.
9915 SW 48th Ave
Portland, Oregon 97219 / US
03 / MO, Stanley
2111 NE 25th Ave
JF1-255
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US
04 / MIAN, Mubashir A.
2186 Esperanca Ave
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Jennings, Vincent Louis , et al
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date12869684.629.02.2012
WO2012US27077
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013130058
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2820899
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W64/00, H04W88/02, G01S5/02, G01S19/00
[2015/23]
Former International [2015/02]H04W64/00, H04W88/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:POSITIONSDISKREPANZKORREKTUREN AUF DER BASIS VON GEMEINSCHAFTSKORREKTUREN UND BAHNERKENNUNG[2015/02]
English:LOCATION DISCREPANCY CORRECTIONS BASED ON COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS AND TRAJECTORY DETECTION[2015/02]
French:CORRECTIONS DE DIVERGENCE DE LOCALISATION BASÉES SUR DES CORRECTIONS DE COMMUNAUTÉ ET UNE DÉTECTION DE TRAJECTOIRE[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
02.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010109948  (RAZOUMOV LEONID [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0037] - [0049]; figures 1-6 * [I] 4,5,7,9-12,15;
 [A]US7561101  (TESTER DAVID P [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * columns 2,3,7,13; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2010088019  (BARCKLAY BOB [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009009397  (TAYLOR KIRK S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009192709  (YONKER JASON B [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]US2010332125  (HAN-SHUE TAN ET AL.);
 [A]US2007290828  (KI-WAN CHOI ET AL.);
 [A]KR20110061978  (CELIZION CO.);
 [A]US2004044477  (MUN HO JUNG ET AL.)
by applicantUS2010109948