Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822205

EP2822205 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
1026-6, Hogye-Dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sung Han
1-301 Yuhwan 3 Cha Apt.
Hogye-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-849 / KR
02 / KWON, Dae Hyun
101-1508 Heungwha Brownville
337 Hogye 2-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-830 / KR
03 / OH, Joon Seok
102-202 Hansol Solpark Apt.
Dangjeong-dong
Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-778 / KR
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date12870208.122.10.2012
[2016/32]
WO2012KR08651
Priority number, dateUS201261605764P02.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261605764 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013129750
Date:06.09.2013
Language:KO
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822205
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2822205
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L12/70, H03M13/09
[2015/37]
Former International [2015/02]H04L1/00, H04L12/70
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2015/02]
English:COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD[2015/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase24.09.2014Translation filed 
24.09.2014National basic fee paid 
24.09.2014Search fee paid 
24.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
10.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2016Fee for grant paid
27.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201504   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.10.2012
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
TR10.08.2016
IE22.10.2016
LU22.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU22.10.2012
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
TR10.08.2016
IE22.10.2016
LU22.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/32]HU22.10.2012
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE22.10.2016
LU22.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU22.10.2012
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE22.10.2016
LU22.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
IE22.10.2016
LU22.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/43]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
LU22.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/35]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO10.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT10.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009327826  (INOUE TOMOHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-9,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0024] - [0 26] , [0027] , [0030] - [0045] - [0063] , [0080] * * figures 1-15 * [I] 3-5,10,14,16;
 [I]WO9949695  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-16 * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 8 * * page 5, lines 15-20 * * page 6, lines 7-21 * * page 8, line 19 - page 20, line 16 * * claims 10, 11 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0237211  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 3-5,10-12 * page 15, line 14 - page 16, line 33 * * page 19, line 3 - page 20, line 23 * * figures 6,7 *
International search[X]WO2011042514  (THOMSON LICENSING ET AL.);
 [A]KR20100124650  (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE);
 [A]KR20010018814  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]US7433370  (TYMES, LAROY);
 [A]EP0987918  (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION)