Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2822205


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
16.06.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
15.06.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
08.07.2016 (Expected) grant published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
05.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.07.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.02.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.11.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
13.11.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.08.2015 Change - classification published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
07.08.2015 Change - classification published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
07.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
08.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
05.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
05.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
16.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication