Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814192

EP2814192 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/45]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Rui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LIU, Sheng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / DU, Yinggang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date12870293.319.05.2012
[2019/45]
WO2012CN75784
Priority number, dateCN2012105007429.02.2012         Original published format: CN201210050074
[2014/51]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013127129
Date:06.09.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814192
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2814192
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/03, H04L1/00, H04B7/04, H04B7/0456, H04B7/06
[2019/25]
Former International [2015/15]H04L1/00, H04W52/28, H04L25/03, H04B7/04
Former International [2014/51]H04L1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG[2014/51]
English:SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAUX[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2014Translation filed 
12.09.2014National basic fee paid 
12.09.2014Search fee paid 
12.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
23.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2019Fee for grant paid
21.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO2007133051  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1, 5 * [A] 2-4,10-12 [Y] 7,15-17;
 [A]WO2007123366  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-4,7-12,15-17 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - MUSTAPHA AMARA ET AL, "Optimized linear receivers and power allocation for two Multi-User MIMO downlink schemes with linear precoding", COMMUNICATIONS, CONTROL AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ISCCSP), 2010 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100303), ISBN 978-1-4244-6285-8, pages 1 - 5, XP031675686 [A] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MICHAEL MAO WANG ET AL, "Multi-antenna Techniques in Ultra Mobile Broadband Communication Systems", COMMUNICATION NETWORKS AND SERVICES RESEARCH CONFERENCE, 2008. CNSR 2008. 6TH ANNUAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080505), ISBN 978-0-7695-3135-9, pages 397 - 403, XP031252469 [Y] 7,15-17 * the whole document *
International search[A]CN102158310  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]CN1983918  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN101305529  (NOKIA CORP [FI]);
 [A]US8078185  (SUN HONGMEI [CN], et al)