Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825002

EP2825002 - CARRIER-ATTACHED METAL FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freesia Macross Corporation
6-8-3 Sotokanda
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SASAKI, Beji
6-8-3 Sotokanda
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date12870817.931.08.2012
WO2012JP72150
Priority number, dateJP2012004884706.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012048847
JP2012018539724.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012185397
[2015/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013132680
Date:12.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825002
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/09, B32B7/04, B32B15/04, H05K3/00
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:TRÄGERBEFESTIGTE METALLFOLIE[2015/03]
English:CARRIER-ATTACHED METAL FOIL[2015/03]
French:FEUILLE MÉTALLIQUE FIXÉE À UN SUPPORT[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase10.09.2014Translation filed 
10.09.2014National basic fee paid 
10.09.2014Search fee paid 
10.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
27.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP2361762  (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013]; figures 4-7 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0050] * [A] 4-8 [I] 2,3;
 [XI]EP0395871  (GOULD INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 11, line 23 - column 13, line 56; figures 1-9 * [I] 2,3;
 [XAI]JP2011235537  (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4-8 [I] 2,3,9;
 [A]US2004112516  (WILHEIM MARTIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0057] *
International search[X]JP2007311688  (HITACHI CABLE, et al);
 [X]JP2004273531  (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO, et al);
 [X]JP2011235537  (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP);
 [X]JP2010050351  (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO);
 [Y]JP2008270697  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [Y]JP4579347B  (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP.);
 [A]JP2009143233  (NIPPON MINING CO);
 [A]JP2009143234  (NIPPON MINING CO);
 [A]JP2009272589  (NIPPON MINING CO)
by applicantJP2009272589