Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809036

EP2809036 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTABLISHING MULTICAST PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.07.2015  [2015/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Zhenbin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / HUANG, Tieying
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date12871013.419.10.2012
WO2012CN83176
Priority number, dateCN201217141616.03.2012         Original published format: CN201210071416
[2014/49]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013135046
Date:19.09.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809036
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/761, H04L12/18
[2015/02]
Former International [2014/49]H04L12/70
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINRICHTEN EINES MULTICAST-WEGS[2014/49]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTABLISHING MULTICAST PATH[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UN CHEMIN DE MULTIDIFFUSION[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2014Translation filed 
29.08.2014National basic fee paid 
29.08.2014Search fee paid 
29.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
09.06.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US6778531  (KODIALAM MURALIDHARAN S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005160171  (RABIE SAMEH [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - BO RONG ET AL, "Bandwidth Fragmentation Avoided QoS Multicast Routing by Employing Admission Control", ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS, 2005. AINA 2005. 19T H INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN 25-30 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050325), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7695-2249-4, pages 273 - 278, XP010789816 [X] 1,2,9,10 * page 273, column l - page 276, column l * [I] 3-8,11-14
International search[Y]CN1710884  (WUHAN UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY);
 [Y]CN101056247  (HANGZHOU H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.)