Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809036


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.06.2015 Withdrawal of application published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
05.12.2014 Supplementary search report published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
05.12.2014 Change - classification published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
05.12.2014 Change - classification published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
30.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication