Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2809036 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201210071416 EP12871013



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015003451Global Dossier 01.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN83176 19.10.2012
CN201210071416 16.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2809036Global Dossier 07.01.2015A4
EP2809036 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN83176 19.10.2012
CN201210071416 16.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013135046Global Dossier 19.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201210071416 16.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103312616Global Dossier 18.09.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201210071416 16.03.2012