Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828800 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828800



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 404
23.09.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.08.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.08.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.08.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
06.08.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
06.08.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
06.08.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 30
31.07.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.07.2019 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 8
03.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
03.07.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
03.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.07.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.03.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
13.03.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 38
13.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
13.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.10.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
21.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
21.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
21.12.2016 Description Search / examination 7
21.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.09.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
07.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.08.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.05.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
09.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
03.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
16.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
06.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
07.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 58
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
07.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.10.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.08.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.05.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 43