Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2828800


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.08.2019 (Expected) grant published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
06.08.2019 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
06.08.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.08.2019 Change - applicant published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
12.07.2019 Change - classification published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019 Change - classification published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
05.07.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.03.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.02.2019 Change - classification published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
22.02.2019 Change - classification published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Change - classification published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 Change - classification published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Change - classification published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019 Change - classification published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
16.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2016 First examination report
04.05.2016 Change - representative
03.05.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.10.2015 Change - classification published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
16.10.2015 Change - classification published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
16.10.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
03.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
29.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
13.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
30.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
08.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication