Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2828800 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280073388 EP12871642



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013140022Global Dossier 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FI50300 23.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9900158Global Dossier 20.02.2018B2
US2015163064 11.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FI50300 23.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104321789BGlobal Dossier 17.10.2017B
CN104321789 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012FI50300 23.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2828800Global Dossier 11.09.2019B1
EP2828800 18.11.2015A4
EP2828800 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FI50300 23.03.2012