Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828800

EP2828800 - CRYPTOGRAPHICALLY AUTHENTICATED COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LUUKKALA, Vesa-Veikko
Harjuviita 1 A 24b
FI-02110 Espoo / FI
02 / SOVIO, Sampo
Risteyskatu 14
FI-11120 Riihimäki / FI
03 / KAAJA, Harald
Lallankatu 7 B 3
FI-04430 Järvenpää / FI
04 / BOLDYREV, Sergey
Tasbyntie 6C 12
FI-01150 Söderkulla / FI
05 / OLIVER, Ian
Hitåvägen 153
FI-01150 Söderkulla / FI
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Espatent Oy
Kaivokatu 10 D
00100 Helsinki / FI
[2019/37]
Former [2015/05]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date12871642.023.03.2012
[2019/37]
WO2012FI50300
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140022
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828800
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828800
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, H04L9/08, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04L9/32, // H04L29/08
[2019/11]
Former International [2015/47]G06K19/07, H04L9/08, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04L9/32, // H04L29/08, H04W76/02
Former International [2015/05]G06K19/07, H04L9/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KRYPTOGRAPHISCH AUTHENTIFIZIERTE KOMMUNIKATION[2015/05]
English:CRYPTOGRAPHICALLY AUTHENTICATED COMMUNICATION[2015/05]
French:COMMUNICATION AUTHENTIFIÉE DE MANIÈRE CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2014National basic fee paid 
07.10.2014Search fee paid 
07.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
02.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.07.2019Fee for grant paid
03.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
06.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2088562  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2007100921  (BARNETT RAYMOND E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2007250704  (HALLAM-BAKER PHILLIP MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0077] *
International search[Y]US2004066278  (HUGHES MICHAEL A ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007133790  (CHANG SHAO-CHANG ET AL.);
 [Y]CN1991859B  (IND TECH RES INST- IND TECH RES INST);
 [Y]CN101673351  (BEIJING TONGFANG MICROELECTRON);
 [A]EP2077514  (BRITISH TELECOMM);
 [A]US2011320805  (CHAVES LEONARDO WEISS F ET AL.)
ExaminationEP2357754
 US2008027865
    - Anonymous, "Public key certificate - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20120310), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Public_key_certificate&oldid=481234367, (20160829), XP055298287
by applicantEP2088562