Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2798184 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2798184



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 137
08.11.2018 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.08.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
30.05.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
28.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.05.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
14.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.05.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.09.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
15.09.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 5
22.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
10.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
07.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21