Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798184

EP2798184 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH FAN VARIABLE AREA NOZZLE FOR LOW FAN PRESSURE RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOHLENBERG, Gregory A.
45 Gianna Lane
Kensington, Connecticut 06037 / US
02 / ZAMORA, Sean P.
37 Old Tolland Turnpike
Coventry, Connecticut 06238 / US
03 / SCHWARZ, Frederick M.
121 Steep Hollow Drive
Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date12871743.628.12.2012
WO2012US71928
Priority number, dateUS20111334077130.12.2011         Original published format: US201113340771
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141932
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798184
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F02K1/06
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:GASTURBINENMOTOR MIT LÜFTERDÜSE MIT VERÄNDERLICHEM BEREICH FÜR NIEDRIGES LÜFTERDRUCKVERHÄLTNIS[2014/45]
English:GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH FAN VARIABLE AREA NOZZLE FOR LOW FAN PRESSURE RATIO[2014/45]
French:MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE BUSE À SECTION VARIABLE DE SOUFFLANTE PERMETTANT UN RAPPORT DE PRESSION SOUFFLANTE FAIBLE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Search fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
10.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.01.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.10.2018Request for further processing filed
24.10.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.11.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009226303  (GRABOWSKI ZBIGNIEW M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0015] - [0022] - [0024] , [0026] , [0028] - [0031] * [I] 6,8;
 [X]US2011004388  (WINTER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0025] - [0027] - [0032] - [0034] - [0037] , [0041] , [0042] , [0043] *;
 [A]US2009053058  (KOHLENBERG GREGORY A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6c * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0022] - [0028] - [0032] , [0033] *
International search[Y]US2009053058  (KOHLENBERG ET AL);
 [Y]US3747343  (ROSEN);
 [A]US2011302907  (MURPHY);
 [A]US2006179818  (MERCHANT)
by applicantUS2009226303
 US2011004388
 US2009053058