Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830183

EP2830183 - POWER CONSUMPTION MODE GUIDING DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Osaka Gas Co., Ltd.
1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP
For all designated states
Wind Engineering Center Co., Ltd.
8-7, Sumida 4-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo
1310031 / JP
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAO Kunihiro
c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD.
1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP
02 / YAKIRE Koji
c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD.
1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP
03 / HIRAI Tomoyuki
c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD.
1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP
04 / NAGATA Satoshi
c/o WIND ENGINEERING CENTER CO., LTD.
8-7, Sumida 4-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 1310031 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bismarckstraße 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date12872175.023.03.2012
[2016/49]
WO2012JP57522
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140604
Date:26.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830183
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830183
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/00, H02J3/38
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINES STROMVERBRAUCHSMODUS[2015/05]
English:POWER CONSUMPTION MODE GUIDING DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2015/05]
French:DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE D'UN MODE DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2014Translation filed 
26.09.2014National basic fee paid 
26.09.2014Search fee paid 
26.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
04.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2016Fee for grant paid
25.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2016
Opposition(s)08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IE23.03.2017
LU23.03.2017
MT23.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/13]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IE23.03.2017
LU23.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/10]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
LU23.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/52]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/38]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/31]ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010090532  (SHELTON JOHN C [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0051]; figures 2-6 *;
 [I]EP2224570  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2,3 *;
 [AD]WO2010103650  (VPEC INC [JP], et al) [AD] 1,2,5,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011175443  (KOYANAGI KAORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0066]; figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0088]; figures 6, 7 *;
 [A]US2006122738  (YAMADA KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0070] *;
 [A]DE102009050042  (RWE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-3 *;
 []US2012161704  (GAUL ARMIN [DE], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP2317640  (GE JENBACHER GMBH & CO OHG [AT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 *
International search[Y]WO2010103650  (VPEC INC [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2006094578  (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL);
 [Y]JP2011019380  (CENTRAL RES INST ELECTRIC POWER IND);
 [Y]JP2002044883  (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO, et al);
 [Y]JP2007020289  (TEMPEARL INDUSTRIAL)
by applicantWO2010103650