Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2831872

EP2831872 - MULTI-SENSOR VELOCITY DEPENDENT CONTEXT AWARE VOICE RECOGNITION AND SUMMARIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / DANIEL, Kevin, Jay
14786 SW Jonagold Terrace
Tigard, Oregon 97224 / US
02 / BELTMAN, Willem, Marinus
18298 Upper Midhill Drive
West Linn, Oregon 97068 / US
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/06]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12872719.530.03.2012
WO2012US31399
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013147835
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2831872
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G10L15/00
[2015/45]
Former International [2015/06]G10L15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
TitleGerman:MULTISENSOR-GESCHWINDIGKEITSABHÄNGIGE KONTEXTBEWUSSTE SPRACHERKENNUNG UND -ZUSAMMENFASSUNG[2015/06]
English:MULTI-SENSOR VELOCITY DEPENDENT CONTEXT AWARE VOICE RECOGNITION AND SUMMARIZATION[2015/06]
French:RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE ET RÉSUMAGE SENSIBLES AU CONTEXTE, DÉPENDANTS DE LA VITESSE DE MULTIPLES CAPTEURS[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2014National basic fee paid 
04.09.2014Search fee paid 
04.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
20.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
22.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2018
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/10]
11.12.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2375343  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0033] , [0034] , [0050] , [0052] , [0053] , [0056] , [0057] , [0062] , [0063] , [0073] , [0079] *;
 [I]US2012053829  (AGARWAL SUMIT [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0020] , [0021] , [0028] , [0029]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2005223030  (MORRIS TONIA G [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0014] , [0015]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2011173229  (CHOUDHURY SAYEED Z [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0020] , [0029] , [0031] , [0035] , [0039] , [0042]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2010114483  (HEO DONG-KYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0070] , [0082] , [0083]; figures 8A,8B,8C *
International search[X]US2011257974  (KRISTJANSSON TRAUSTI [US], et al);
 [A]US6192343  (MORGAN SCOTT ANTHONY [US], et al);
 [A]US2006116979  (JUNG EDWARD K [US], et al);
 [A]US7987426  (COTTER PAUL [IE], et al)