blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2831738


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.03.2019 First examination report
20.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2018 Change - representative
16.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.10.2015 Change - classification published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
16.10.2015 Change - classification published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
16.10.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
05.06.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
13.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.01.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
02.01.2015 Request for examination filed published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication