blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2831738 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280072088 EP12873302



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013147814Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US31303 29.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9514028Global Dossier 06.12.2016B2
US2014143608 22.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US31303 29.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104220992BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2017B
CN104220992 17.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US31303 29.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2831738Global Dossier 18.11.2015A4
EP2831738 04.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US31303 29.03.2012