Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2831738

EP2831738 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CORRECT EXECUTION OF SOFTWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAWROCK, David W.
8285 SW 184th Avenue
Aloha, Oregon 97007 / US
02 / WALKER, Jesse
2111 NE 25th Avenue
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)Rummler, Felix , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/06]Rummler, Felix
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London, SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12873302.929.03.2012
WO2012US31303
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013147814
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2831738
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/28, G06F11/07, G06F21/00, G06F11/34, H04L29/06
[2015/47]
Former International [2015/06]G06F11/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES RICHTIGEN AUSFÜHRUNG VON SOFTWARE[2015/06]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CORRECT EXECUTION OF SOFTWARE[2015/06]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE EXÉCUTION CORRECTE D'UN LOGICIEL[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
17.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004163079  (NOY ODED [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * the whole document * [I] 7,14;
 [I]US2009019318  (COCHRANE PETER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [I]US2010122120  (LIN YEEJANG JAMES [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0060] *
International search[X]US2004163079  (NOY ODED [US], et al);
 [A]US7043718  (AU LAP-KI [US], et al);
 [A]US2008034255  (NAGANO TAKEHIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]US7379999  (ZHOU SHENG [US], et al)
by applicantUS2004163079
 US2009019318
 US2010122120