Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2834181

EP2834181 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM USING DUAL COMMUNICATION CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
One Carrier Place
Farmington CT 06032 / US
[2017/36]
Former [2015/07]For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARVIN, Daryl J.
15 Centerbrook Drive
Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US
02 / JAYACHANDRAN, Vijay
104 Flagg Road
West Hartford, Connecticut 06117 / US
03 / LERNER, Bruce P.
1041 Avon Boulevard
Cheshire, Connecticut 06410 / US
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2019/41]
Former [2015/07]Iceton, Greg James
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date12873526.303.04.2012
[2019/41]
WO2012US31928
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013151533
Date:10.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2834181
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013
[2015/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2834181
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:B66B1/34, H04W4/80
[2019/10]
Former International [2015/07]B66B1/06, B66B1/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFZUGSSYSTEM MIT ZWEI KOMMUNIKATIONSKANÄLEN[2015/07]
English:ELEVATOR SYSTEM USING DUAL COMMUNICATION CHANNELS[2015/07]
French:SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR UTILISANT DEUX CANAUX DE COMMUNICATION[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2014National basic fee paid 
29.10.2014Search fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
29.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2019Fee for grant paid
21.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0544543  (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1,5,7,10,12,15 * figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6,8,9,11,13,14;
 [X]EP0239662  (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 15 * figure 1 *
International search[X]JP2002114459  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]KR20040052419  (HYUNDAI ELEVATOR CO LTD);
 [A]KR100259507B  (LG IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR100440428B  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION)
ExaminationUS2002199120