Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2834428

EP2834428 - CONCRETE REINFORCING FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.02.2018  [2018/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Polytorx, LLC
300 North 5th Ave.
Suite 130
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PINKERTON, Luke
804 Berkshire
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
02 / STECHER, Joseph, L.
712 Atwood St. NE
Grand Rapids, MI 49503 / US
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]Solf, Annkathrin
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date12873543.814.09.2012
WO2012US55567
Priority number, dateUS201261619466P03.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261619466 P
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013151580
Date:10.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2834428
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:E04C5/03, B21F45/00, E04C5/01, B21F5/00, B21F7/00, B21F11/00, C04B14/48, D02G3/12
[2016/11]
Former International [2015/07]E04C5/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
TitleGerman:BETONVERSTÄRKUNGSFASERN[2015/07]
English:CONCRETE REINFORCING FIBERS[2015/07]
French:FIBRES DE RENFORT POUR BÉTON[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2014National basic fee paid 
31.10.2014Search fee paid 
31.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
31.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/09]
17.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2260779  (ERNST HOFFMANN) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,18,19,21,22,26 * figures 1-5 * * the whole document * [I] 3,6-8,13-18,20,23-25;
 [I]DE4218450  (ME FASERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-4,18-21,26 * the whole document *;
 [I]US4804585  (TANI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,18,20 * figures 1, 2a, 2b, 11, 12a, 12b,15, 16a, 16b, 24 *
International search[X]US4804585  (TANI YOSHIO [JP], et al);
 [Y]KR20090010734  (RES INST IND SCIENCE & TECH [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2216758  (RUDOLF SCHMIDT);
 [Y]US2256060  (STITES JOSEPH D);
 [A]US2217301  (ODD WENNBERG);
 [A]US8044139  (YOUN BUM-SEOK [KR], et al)