Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2840859

EP2840859 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND TERMINAL FOR TOURISM SCENIC AREA NOTIFICATION BASED ON AD HOC NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CUI, Jie
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZOU, Wei
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/09]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/09]
Application number, filing date12874873.818.06.2012
WO2012CN77113
Priority number, dateCN20121011746319.04.2012         Original published format: CN201210117463
[2015/09]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013155781
Date:24.10.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2840859
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN24.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/18
[2015/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND ENDGERÄT ZUR BENACHRICHTIGUNG VON TOURISTEN ÜBER LANDSCHAFTLICH REIZVOLLE GEGEND AUF BASIS EINES AD-HOC-NETZWERKS[2015/09]
English:METHOD, SYSTEM AND TERMINAL FOR TOURISM SCENIC AREA NOTIFICATION BASED ON AD HOC NETWORK[2015/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET TERMINAL POUR NOTIFICATION D'AIRE SCÉNIQUE DE TOURISME BASÉE SUR UN RÉSEAU AD HOC[2015/09]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2014Translation filed 
11.11.2014National basic fee paid 
11.11.2014Search fee paid 
11.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
29.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]CN101896002  (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0085] *;
 [A]US2010302945  (LEPPANEN KARI J [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0140] * * figure 3C *
International search[X]CN101896002  (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG);
 [A]CN101277266  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [A]CN101577954  (NANJING ZHENGBAO COMM NETWORK [CN]);
 [A]CN101662403  (IBM)