Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2846194

EP2846194 - END SEALANT FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE-FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shoji, Susumu
3-3 Otsuka-cho 8 chome Nagata-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 653-0811 / JP
For all designated states
Sanwa Techno Co., Ltd
2-28 Takamatsu-cho
Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0874 / JP
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUI Kazuro
c/o SANWA TECHNO CO. LTD
4-27 Karumo-dori 7 chome
Nagata-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 653-0032 / JP
02 / SHOJI, Susumu
3-3 Otsuka-cho 8 chome
Nagata-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 653-0811 / JP
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/50]
Former [2015/11]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12876034.530.04.2012
[2018/50]
WO2012JP61497
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013164871
Date:07.11.2013
Language:JA
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2846194
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2846194
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08
[2016/02]
Former International [2015/11]G03G15/08, G03G15/00, G03G21/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENDVERSIEGELUNG FÜR ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2015/11]
English:END SEALANT FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE-FORMING DEVICE[2015/11]
French:MATIÈRE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ D'EXTRÉMITÉ POUR DISPOSITIF FORMANT IMAGE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2014Translation filed 
04.11.2014National basic fee paid 
04.11.2014Search fee paid 
04.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
13.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.09.2018Fee for grant paid
06.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.10.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
31.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2018
Opposition(s)13.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SI12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
LU30.04.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/02]AL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SI12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/50]AL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SI12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/48]AL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/46]AL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/24]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011138822  (SANWA TECHNO CO LTD [JP]; SHOJI SUSUMU [JP]; FUKUI KAZURO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [AD]JP2000170919  (SANWA TECHNO KK) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS60191056U  (UNKNOWN) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2009093079  (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2003149939  (CANON KK);
 [A]JP2003107902  (BROTHER IND LTD)
by applicantJP2000170919
 JP2003107902
 JP2007179080
 JPH11194612
 JP19900210476
 JP19970274380