Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2849470

EP2849470 - FUNCTION SHARING IN WIRELESS ACCESS HOTSPOT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/12]METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING FUNCTION SHARING IN WIRELESS ACCESS HOTSPOT DEVICE
[2018/15]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, SM
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/09]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Jie
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/09]
Former [2015/12]01 / YANG, Jie
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-TechIndustrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2019/09]
Former [2015/12]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12876412.313.07.2012
[2019/09]
WO2012CN78631
Priority number, dateCN20121014636611.05.2012         Original published format: CN201210146366
[2015/12]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013166776
Date:14.11.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2849470
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2849470
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN14.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04W4/00, // H04W12/06, H04W48/16, H04W84/12
[2018/14]
Former International [2015/24]H04W8/00, // H04W88/04
Former International [2015/12]H04W8/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONSTEILUNG IN EINER HOTSPOT-VORRICHTUNG MIT DRAHTLOSEM ZUGANG[2018/15]
English:FUNCTION SHARING IN WIRELESS ACCESS HOTSPOT DEVICE[2018/15]
French:PARTAGE DE FONCTION DANS UN DISPOSITIF HOTSPOT D'ACCÈS SANS FIL[2018/15]
Former [2015/12]VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER FUNKTIONSTEILUNG IN EINER HOTSPOT-VORRICHTUNG MIT DRAHTLOSEM ZUGANG
Former [2015/12]METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING FUNCTION SHARING IN WIRELESS ACCESS HOTSPOT DEVICE
Former [2015/12]PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE MISE EN UVRE D'UN PARTAGE DE FONCTION DANS UN DISPOSITIF HOTSPOT D'ACCÈS SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase14.11.2013Translation filed 
12.11.2014National basic fee paid 
12.11.2014Search fee paid 
12.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
22.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2018Fee for grant paid
26.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201807   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2019
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]CN102255902  (LIAO CHUANDONG) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0073] *;
 [Y]EP1370050  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 7,7A,10 *;
 [A]US2003236982  (HSU RAYMOND T [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3,5 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0039] , [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0066] *;
 [A]EP2337312  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0007] , [0041] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 3A-3C *
International search[X]CN101617518  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB LM);
 [A]CN1635811  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101044714  (THOMSON LICENSING, INC.)