blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2882796

EP2882796 - VINYL CARBOSILOXANE RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel IP & Holding GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstraße 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/09]For all designated states
Henkel IP & Holding GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/25]For all designated states
Henkel IP & Holding GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
Henkel AG&Co. KGAA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KONG, Shengqian
9 Bloomingdale Drive
Apt 322
Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US
02 / ZHANG, Liwei
22-1201 West Chuangxin Road
Pudong New Dristrict
Shanghai 201203 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Yong
50-1205
No.1728 Lane Chengshan Road
Pudong
Shanghai 201000 / CN
04 / XING, Wentao Thomas
No. 928 Zhangheng Road
Zhangjiang High Technology Park
Pudong New Dristrict
Shanghai 201203 / CN
05 / DUFFY, Daniel J.
1648 Brookdale Road
Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2017/09]
Former [2015/25]Alarcon, Minna Maarit
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
CLI
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date12878220.806.06.2012
[2017/09]
WO2012CN76509
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013181801
Date:12.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2882796
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2882796
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN12.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2015
ClassificationIPC:C08G77/20, C08G77/12, C08L83/07, C08L83/05, C08G77/50
[2015/49]
CPC:
C08G77/20 (EP,KR,US); C08G77/12 (EP,KR,US); C08G77/38 (US);
C08G77/42 (KR); C08G77/50 (EP,US); C08K5/56 (EP,US);
C08L83/00 (EP,US); C08L83/10 (KR); C08L83/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2650/20 (KR); C08G77/045 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L83/14, C08L83/00, C08K5/56 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2015/25]C08G77/20, C08G77/12, C08L83/07, C08L83/05
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VINYLCARBOSILOXANHARZE[2015/25]
English:VINYL CARBOSILOXANE RESINS[2015/25]
French:RÉSINES DE VINYLCARBOSILOXANE[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2014National basic fee paid 
17.12.2014Search fee paid 
17.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/25]
25.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2017Fee for grant paid
10.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.09.2016
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
07.01.201503   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2015
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2012
AL01.03.2017
AT01.03.2017
CY01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MK01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
TR01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
MT06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/15]HU06.06.2012
AT01.03.2017
CY01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MK01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
TR01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
MT06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2019/51]HU06.06.2012
AT01.03.2017
CY01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MK01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
MT06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2019/48]HU06.06.2012
AT01.03.2017
CY01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
MT06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2019/31]HU06.06.2012
AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
MT06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/43]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
MT06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/39]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IE06.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
LU06.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/11]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002091193  (HALLORAN DANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * example 2 * [I] 3-7;
 [XI]US2010179283  (SUEYOSHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * examples 4,6 * [I] 3-7;
 [XI]US5656710  (NEWBERTH III FREDERICK F [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * example 3 * [I] 3-7
International search[X]US2002091193  (HALLORAN DANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [X]US5656710  (NEWBERTH III FREDERICK F [US], et al);
 [X]US2010179283  (SUEYOSHI TAKASHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2010225010  (KATAYAMA HIROYUKI [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.