Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858982

EP2858982 - PYRIDINONE AND PYRIDAZINONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.06.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
North Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2015/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HUBBARD, Robert Dale
2796 Hancock Court
Lindenhurst, Illinois 60046 / US
02 / MCDANIEL, Keith F.
26029 W. Laurel Court
Wauconda, Illinois 60084 / US
03 / PARK, Chang Hoon
2871 N. Southern Hills Drive
Wadsworth, Illinois 60083 / US
04 / PRATT, John K.
8210 61st Avenue
Kenosha, Wisconsin 53142 / US
05 / SOLTWEDEL, Todd
4808 W Strong Street
Chicago, Illinois 60630 / US
06 / SUN, Chaohong
390 Churchill Lane
Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US
07 / WANG, Le
338 East Colonial Drive
Vernon Hills, Illinois 60061 / US
08 / WENDT, Michael D
1445 Maidstone Drive
Vernon Hills, Illinois 60061 / US
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Schlich, George , et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12878861.912.06.2012
WO2012CN76748
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013185284
Date:19.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2858982
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/02, C07D401/06, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, A61K31/351, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61P29/00
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
TitleGerman:PYRIDINON- UND PYRIDAZINONDERIVATE[2015/16]
English:PYRIDINONE AND PYRIDAZINONE DERIVATIVES[2015/16]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIDINONE ET DE PYRIDAZINONE[2015/16]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2014National basic fee paid 
09.12.2014Search fee paid 
09.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/16]
24.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.10.2017Request for further processing filed
10.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.10.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
24.08.2016Request for further processing filed
24.08.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.09.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
24.08.2016Request for further processing filed
24.08.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.09.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004067955  (TABUCHI SEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,25,29,30,33,34 * about 100 compounds disclosed therein, among which example 5, 10, 125;; claims 1, 11, 12 *;
 [X]EP1308441  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,14,15,25,29,30,33-36 * claims 1, 24, 36, 38; compounds 5-8, 77, 89, 93, 103a, 111, 118, 120, 121 *;
 [E]WO2013045519  (GENFIT [FR], et al) [E] 1,2,14,15,25,29-36 * compounds 4-86, 4-88, 4-90; page 33, line 8 - line 36; figure 7a; claims 1, 18, 19 *;
 [X]WO2008033854  (CGI PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * compounds 5, 10-13 *;
 [X]US4699914  (HILBOLL GERD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * examples 16, 20 and 22 as well as several examples in column 18 *;
 [X]WO2011109261  (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 1-4,25 * examples 1-4, 11-13; claims 1, 11, 13 *;
 [X]  - ROBERTS D A ET AL, "1,2,4-TRIAZOLO not 4,3-A 3/4 PYRAZINE DERIVATIVES WITH HUMAN RENIN INHIBITORY ACTIVITY. 1. SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL PROPERTIES OF ALKYL ALCOHOL AND STATINE DERIVATIVES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19900101), vol. 33, no. 9, doi:10.1021/JM00171A005, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2326 - 2334, XP001074262 [X] 1-3 * compounds 4a, 4c *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00171a005
 [T]  - JEAN-MARC GARNIER ET AL, "BET bromodomain inhibitors: a patent review", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, (20140201), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1517/13543776.2014.859244, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 185 - 199, XP055121821 [T] 1-36 * figures 1-13 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.2014.859244
International search[A]CN101910182  (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP);
 [A]WO2012075456  (CONSTELLATION PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al)
by applicantUS2004067955
 EP1308441
 WO2013045519
 WO2008033854
 US4699914
 WO2011109261
 WO2010066682
 WO9710223
 WO2005099353P
 WO1995007271P
 WO2006008754P
 US7538189
 US7534814
 US7531685
 US7528131
 US7521421
 US7514068
 US7511013
 US2009137457
 US2009131485
 US2009131363
 US2009118238
 US2009111840
 US2009105338
 US2009105307
 US2009105147
 US2009093422
 US2009088416
 US2009082471
 WO2006129623
    - YANG et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (20080000), vol. 28, pages 967 - 976
    - LEROY et al., Mol. Cell, (20080000), vol. 30, pages 51 - 60
    - ZUBER et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 478, pages 524 - 528
    - MERTZ et al., Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci., (20110000), vol. 108, pages 16669 - 16674
    - DELMORE et al., Cell, (20110000), vol. 146, pages 1 - 14
    - DAWSON et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 478, pages 529 - 533
    - HUANG et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (20090000), vol. 29, pages 1375 - 1387
    - NICODEME et al., Nature, (20100000), vol. 468, pages 1119 - 1123
    - JANG et al., Mol. Cell, (20050000), vol. 19, pages 523 - 534
    - ROBERTS et al., J. Med. Chem., (19900000), vol. 33, no. 9, pages 2326 - 2364
    - "IUPAC 1974 Recommendations for Section E, Fundamental Stereochemistry", Pure Appl. Chem., (19760000), vol. 45, pages 13 - 10
    - LIZONDO, J et al., Drugs Fut, (19960000), vol. 21, no. 11, page 1116
    - BRICKNER, S J et al., J Med Chem, (19960000), vol. 39, no. 3, page 673
    - MALLESHAM, B et al., Org Lett, (20030000), vol. 5, no. 7, page 963
    - BLAKE et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19750000), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 367 - 391
    - FOSTER et al., Advances in Drug Research, Academic press, (19850000), vol. 14, pages 2 - 36
    - KATO et al., J. Labelled Comp. Radiopharmaceut., (19950000), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 927 - 932
    - KUSHNER et al., Can. J. Physiol. Pharmacol., (19990000), vol. 77, pages 79 - 88
    - CZAJKA D M; FINKEL A J, Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19600000), vol. 84, page 70
    - THOMSON J F, Ann. New York Acad. Sci, (19600000), vol. 84, page 736
    - CZAKJA D M et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19610000), vol. 201, page 357
    - BLAGOJEVIC N et al., Dosimetry & Treatment Planning for Neutron Capture Therapy, Advanced Medical Publishing, (19940000), pages 125 - 134
    - Diabetes Metab., (19970000), vol. 23, page 251
    - N. MIYAMA; A. SUZUKI, Chem. Rev., (19950000), vol. 95, pages 2457 - 2483
    - J. Organomet. Chem., (19990000), vol. 576, pages 147 - 148
    - S. M. BERGE et al., J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - Methods in Cell Biology, Academic Press, (19760000), vol. XIV, page 33
    - V.R. SUTTON; D.L. VAUX; J.A. TRAPANI, J. of Immunology, (19970000), vol. 158, no. 12, page 5783
    - EASTWOOD et al., J Biomol Screen, (20060000), vol. 11, pages 253 - 261