Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829726

EP2829726 - WIND TURBINE GENERATOR AND INSTALLATION METHOD OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/05]WIND POWER GENERATION DEVICE AND CONSTRUCTION METHOD FOR SAME
[2016/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
For all designated states
MHI Vestas Offshore Wind A/S
Dusager 4
8200 Aarhus N / DK
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIOKA, Yoshihiro
C/O MHI Plant Engineering Co. Ltd.
12 Nishikicho
Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-8715 / JP
02 / KAMIBAYASHI, Masakazu
C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158 rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date12881143.714.12.2012
[2016/22]
WO2012JP82497
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014091617
Date:19.06.2014
Language:JA
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829726
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829726
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F03D80/00, F16N31/00, F03D7/02
[2016/22]
Former International [2015/17]F03D11/00, F16N31/00, F03D7/02
Former International [2015/05]F03D11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WINDTURBINENGENERATOR UND INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2015/05]
English:WIND TURBINE GENERATOR AND INSTALLATION METHOD OF THE SAME[2016/01]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉOLIENNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION[2016/01]
Former [2015/05]WIND POWER GENERATION DEVICE AND CONSTRUCTION METHOD FOR SAME
Former [2015/05]DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ÉOLIENNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION
Entry into regional phase23.01.2014Translation filed 
23.01.2014National basic fee paid 
23.01.2014Search fee paid 
23.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
07.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.03.2016Fee for grant paid
29.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2015
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2012
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU14.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU14.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU14.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU14.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
NL01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2011138595  (SHIRAISHI YASUAKI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4 * [A] 14,15;
 [Y]US2010109333  (TEIPEN EWALD [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] *
International search[A]US2010124507  (JACK WALLACE);
 [A]WO2009149699  (INNOVATIVE WINDPOWER AG);
 [A]WO2011064002  (SIEMENS AG)
by applicantEP2196668