Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2829726


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
07.04.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
29.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
29.04.2016 Change - classification published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
29.04.2016 Change - classification published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
08.04.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.04.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.04.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.02.2016 Change - extension states published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
05.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.12.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.12.2015 Change - English title published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
04.12.2015 Change - French title published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
13.10.2015 Amendment by applicant
20.03.2015 Change - classification published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - classification published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
07.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2014 Amendment by applicant
24.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication