Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2875640

EP2875640 - VIDEO QUALITY ASSESSMENT AT A BITSTREAM LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/45]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LIAO, Ning
Room 507
Building 3
Xuezhi Yuan
Xueqing Road, Haidian District
Beijing 100083 / CN
02 / CHEN, Zhibo
Room 1613 Yuehua Xuan
Beitaipingzhuang Rd.
Haidian District
Beijing 100088 / CN
03 / XIE, Kai
Room 501
Unit 12
Building 19
Block 2, Tiantongxiyuan, Changping Area
Beijing 102218 / CN
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Vidon Brevets & Stratégie
16B, rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/45]Vidon Brevets & Stratégie
16B, rue de Jouanet
B.P. 90333
Technopole Atalante
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
Former [2015/22]Rossmanith, Manfred , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date12881157.717.07.2012
[2017/45]
WO2012CN78766
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014012219
Date:23.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2875640
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2875640
Date:08.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/154, H04N19/139, H04N19/86, H04N19/895
[2016/09]
Former International [2015/22]H04N17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIDEOQUALITÄTSBESTIMMUNG AUF BITSTROM-EBENE[2015/22]
English:VIDEO QUALITY ASSESSMENT AT A BITSTREAM LEVEL[2015/22]
French:ÉVALUATION DE LA QUALITÉ D'UNE VIDÉO À L'ÉCHELLE D'UN TRAIN DE BITS[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2015National basic fee paid 
21.01.2015Search fee paid 
21.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
19.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2017Fee for grant paid
28.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2017
Opposition(s)09.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
MT17.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/24]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
LU17.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
NO08.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2013075318  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]; ZHANG FAN [CN]; LIAO NING [CN]; XIE KAI [CN];) [E] 1,2,11,12 * figure 7 * * page 9, lines 5-7 * * page 19, line 13 - page 21, line 4 *
 [XA]  - TING-LAN LIN ET AL, "A Versatile Model for Packet Loss Visibility and its Application to Packet Prioritization", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100301), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TIP.2009.2038834, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 722 - 735, XP011286403 [X] 1,2,4,11,12,14 * page 726 * [A] 3,5-10,13,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2009.2038834
International search[A]CN101213846  (SK TELECOM CO., LTD. ET AL.);
 [A]US2010053335  (UNIV. SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND CORP. COLLABORATION);
 [A]US2011206298  (THOMSON LICENSING)