Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2883522

EP2883522 - UNDERWEAR-TYPE WORN ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2017/29]
Former [2015/25]For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ICHIKAWA, Makoto
c/o Technical Center
Unicharm Corporation
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / TAGAWA, Nobuhiro
c/o Technical Center
Unicharm Corporation
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12882709.410.10.2012
[2017/29]
WO2012JP76171
Priority number, dateJP2012017543807.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012175438
JP2012018806428.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012188064
[2015/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014024326
Date:13.02.2014
Language:JA
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2883522
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2883522
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/49, A61F13/514
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNTERWÄSCHEARTIGER TRAGBARER ARTIKEL[2015/25]
English:UNDERWEAR-TYPE WORN ARTICLE[2015/25]
French:VÊTEMENT DE TYPE SOUS-VÊTEMENT[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2015Translation filed 
09.01.2015National basic fee paid 
09.01.2015Search fee paid 
09.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
26.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2017Fee for grant paid
02.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.04.2018  24.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.2018  24.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2018/21]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.2018   
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
07.05.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.09.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.10.2012
AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE10.10.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/45]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE10.10.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/36]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/26]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2098200  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0036] *;
 [D]JP2005027839  (LIVEDO CORP)
International search[Y]WO2008078610  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2012024463  (DAIO SEISHI KK);
 [Y]JP2002320641  (KAO CORP);
 [Y]JP2008212232  (DAIO SEISHI KK)
by applicantJP2005027839
OppositionJP2008228834
 WO2011048513
 US2005288648
 JP2005087622