Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814201

EP2814201 - NOTIFICATION MESSAGE SENDING METHOD AND MANAGEMENT CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/51]NOTIFICATION MESSAGE SENDING METHOD, SYSTEM, MANIPULATION APPARATUS, AND TERMINAL DEVICE
[2019/08]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/28]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Zhihong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date12883103.920.08.2012
[2019/28]
WO2012CN80348
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014029061
Date:27.02.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814201
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814201
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN27.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, G06F21/10
[2015/08]
Former International [2014/51]H04L12/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON BENACHRICHTIGUNGEN UND VERWALTUNGSSTEUERVORRICHTUNG[2019/08]
English:NOTIFICATION MESSAGE SENDING METHOD AND MANAGEMENT CONTROL APPARATUS[2019/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI DE MESSAGES DE NOTIFICATION ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE LA GESTION[2019/08]
Former [2014/51]VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON BENACHRICHTIGUNGEN, SYSTEM, MANIPULATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄT
Former [2014/51]NOTIFICATION MESSAGE SENDING METHOD, SYSTEM, MANIPULATION APPARATUS, AND TERMINAL DEVICE
Former [2014/51]PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI DE MESSAGES DE NOTIFICATION, SYSTÈME, APPAREIL DE MANIPULATION ET DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL
Entry into regional phase10.09.2014Translation filed 
10.09.2014National basic fee paid 
10.09.2014Search fee paid 
10.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
12.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2019Fee for grant paid
06.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]  - James Bruce, "How To Use Find My iPhone To Get Your Stolen iPhone Back", Internet, (20111106), URL: http://www.makeuseof.com/tag/find-iphone-stolen-iphone/, (20150112), XP055161341 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]CN101374123  (LIAN, SI ET AL.);
 [A]CN102624570  (HANGZHOU EASTCOM- BUPT INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY LTD.);
 [A]CN102456038  (ZHENJIANG YCTIONSOFT CO., LTD.)