Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814201 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814201



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 195
22.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
24.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.01.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.01.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.01.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
31.01.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
03.12.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.08.2018 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
25.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 7
19.01.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
18.11.2014 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 3
24.09.2014 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
10.09.2014 Description Search / examination 20
10.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
10.09.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.02.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.02.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
27.02.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 31